WA HB1320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain gold star license plate qualified applicants and recipients.
Title
Concerning certain gold star license plate qualified applicants and recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-17 | House | Chapter 24, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5209 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.