WA HB1319 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing collision reporting criteria triggering driver's license reexamination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing collision reporting criteria triggering driver's license reexamination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseEffective date 7/23/2023.
2023-04-06HouseChapter 29, 2023 Laws.
2023-04-06HouseGovernor signed.
2023-03-31HouseDelivered to Governor.
2023-03-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-03-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-03-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2023-03-22SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-03-13SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-03-09SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2023-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-22HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-02-14HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-09HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

SB5216 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4652070Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1319&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1319.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1319.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1319.SL.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1319%20HBA%20TR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1319%20HBR%20TR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1319%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1319%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1319%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1319%20HBR%20PL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1319%20HBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66152
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66309
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127874&actionText=TR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30653&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127874&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1319&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127874&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30902&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127874&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-22-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1319&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback