WA HB1318 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning deficit reimbursement agreements with counties owning and operating ferry systems.
Title
Concerning deficit reimbursement agreements with counties owning and operating ferry systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5307 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1318&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1318.pdf |