WA HB1314 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning veteran diversion from involuntary commitment.
Title
Concerning veteran diversion from involuntary commitment.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. David Hackney [D] |
Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Alicia Rule [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 125, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |