WA HB1309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning removal of land from the current use property tax classification due to certain natural disasters.
Title
Concerning removal of land from the current use property tax classification due to certain natural disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-20 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-03 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5188 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.