WA HB1304 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning individuals receiving both employment and community access services.
Title
Concerning individuals receiving both employment and community access services.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-17 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5201 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.