WA HB1302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning college in the high school programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning college in the high school programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 71, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-17SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-15SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2021-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-23House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-12HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a300560Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a320196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a600New CodeSee Bill Text
28a600290Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28b10035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28b76730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28b95020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1302&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1302.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1302-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1302-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1302-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1302%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1302%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1302-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1302-S%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1302-S%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1302-S%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1302-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1302-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123627&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28599&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123627&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1302&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123627&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28829&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123627&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1302&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback