WA HB1301 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing expanded options for fare enforcement by regional transit authorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing expanded options for fare enforcement by regional transit authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 70, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-30SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2021-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-03House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
780010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81112210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81112220Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1301&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1301.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1301-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1301-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1301-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1301%20HBA%20TR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1301%20HBR%20TR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1301-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1301-S%20SBA%20TRAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1301-S%20SBR%20TRAN%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1301-S%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1301-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1301-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123625&actionText=TR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28646&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123625&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1301&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123625&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28986&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123625&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1301&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback