WA HB1298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning device registration, civil penalties, and service agent registration for the weights and measures program.
Title
Concerning device registration, civil penalties, and service agent registration for the weights and measures program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Chapter 96, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-01 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5468 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.