WA HB1298 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting employers from asking about arrests or convictions before an applicant is determined otherwise qualified for a position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting employers from asking about arrests or convictions before an applicant is determined otherwise qualified for a position.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseEffective date 6/7/2018**.
2018-03-13HouseChapter 38, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-13HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-28SenateCommittee amendment
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-22SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-21SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-02-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-07Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-01-12SenatePlaced on second reading.
2018-01-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-09SenateLAWS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-09SenateExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2018-01-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
2017-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-01House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-22HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-01-30HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-01-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-01-30HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1298&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1298.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1298-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1298-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1298-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1298-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1298&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1298&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-07-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1298&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1298&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2018

Bill Comments

feedback