WA HB1298 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child support order summary report forms.
Title
Concerning child support order summary report forms.
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Kelley [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-11 | Chapter 21, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-04 | President signed. | |
2011-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-30 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2011-02-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-02-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-07 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-03 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-31 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-18 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |