WA HB1296 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a business and occupation tax preference for behavioral health administrative services organizations.
Title
Providing a business and occupation tax preference for behavioral health administrative services organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 4/26/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 124, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-04 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |