WA HB1294 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Hearing: Mar 11 @ 10:30 am in Senate Committee on Law & Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing misdemeanant supervision services by limited jurisdiction courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing misdemeanant supervision services by limited jurisdiction courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
2021-02-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-02-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-29HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1064120Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
3934180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
424760Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7048090Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1294&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1294.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1294-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1294%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1294%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1294-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123618&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28409&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123618&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1294&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback