WA HB1292 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing waivers from the one hundred eighty-day school year requirement in order to allow four-day school weeks.
Title
Authorizing waivers from the one hundred eighty-day school year requirement in order to allow four-day school weeks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-18 | Chapter 543, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-18 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-24 | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-24 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 13; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-22 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-22 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-22 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-20 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-30 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-30 | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-26 | APPE - Majority; do pass ED 09 bill proposed by Education. | |
2009-02-26 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Education Appropriations. | |
2009-02-18 | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Education. |