WA HB1287 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subjecting federally recognized Indian tribes to the same conditions as state and local governments for property owned exclusively by the tribe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subjecting federally recognized Indian tribes to the same conditions as state and local governments for property owned exclusively by the tribe.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseEffective date 6/12/2014.
2014-04-03HouseChapter 207, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2014-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2014-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2014-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2014-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2014-03-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
2014-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2014-03-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2014-03-03SenateMinority; do not pass.
2014-03-03SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2014-03-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2014-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2014-02-14HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2014-02-14HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2014-02-14HouseFloor amendment
2014-02-14House1st substitute bill substituted
2014-02-07HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2014-02-05HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2014-02-04HouseMinority; do not pass.
2014-02-04HouseFIN - Majority; do pass CDHT 14 bill proposed by Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
2014-02-04HouseFIN - Executive action taken by committee.
2014-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2014-01-27HouseReferred to Finance.
2014-01-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2014-01-23HouseCDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2014-01-23HouseCDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
2014-01-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2014-01-13HouseReferred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
2014-01-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2014-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-04-28SenateReturned to House Rules 3.
2013-04-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2013-04-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-04-28SenateCommittee amendment adopted as amended.
2013-04-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-04-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-04-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2013-04-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2013-04-28SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2013-04-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM.
2013-04-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2013-04-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2013-04-18HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2013-04-18HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-04-18HouseFloor amendment
2013-04-18HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2013-03-13HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-03-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2013-03-01HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2013-02-28HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2013-02-28HouseFIN - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-20HouseReferred to Finance.
2013-02-20HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2013-02-18HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-13HouseMinority; do not pass.
2013-02-13HouseCDHT - Majority; do pass.
2013-02-13HouseCDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-13HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM.
2013-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1287&year=2013
Texthttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1287.pdf
Texthttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1287.E.pdf
Texthttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1287-S.pdf
Texthttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1287-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1287-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1287-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/far/RollCall?rollCallId=39166&bienId=22
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/far/RollCall?rollCallId=39418&bienId=22
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/far/RollCall?rollCallId=39895&bienId=22
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/far/RollCall?rollCallId=40505&bienId=22
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/far/RollCall?rollCallId=40629&bienId=22

Bill Comments

feedback