WA HB1286 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Contingent effective date.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Contingent effective date.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the psychology interjurisdictional compact.
Title
Adopting the psychology interjurisdictional compact.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Contingent effective date. |
2022-03-04 | House | Chapter 5, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text |