WA HB1283 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Including the open carry or display of weapons within the offense of criminal mischief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including the open carry or display of weapons within the offense of criminal mischief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-10HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9a84010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1283&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1283.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1283-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1283-S%20AMH%20KLIP%20BUR%20010.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1283-S%20AMH%20KLIP%20BUR%20011.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1283%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1283%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123592&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28578&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback