WA HB1283 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nonprofit organizations engaged in debt adjusting.
Title
Concerning nonprofit organizations engaged in debt adjusting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-06 | House | Chapter 167, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2015-04-16 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2015-04-16 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-28 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-28 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5485 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.