WA HB1282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowed earned time for certain offenses.
Title
Concerning allowed earned time for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. David Hackney [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5285 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.