WA HB1277 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing rules to improve the consistency and quality of the implementation of the fundamental courses of study for paraeducators. Revised for 1st Substitute: Improving the consistency and quality of the implementation of the fundamental course of study for paraeducators.
Title
Establishing rules to improve the consistency and quality of the implementation of the fundamental courses of study for paraeducators. Revised for 1st Substitute: Improving the consistency and quality of the implementation of the fundamental course of study for paraeducators.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Donaghy [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-19 | House | Chapter 173, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-01-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-01-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-26 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |