WA HB1273 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning menstrual products in schools.
Title
Concerning menstrual products in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | House | Chapter 163, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-04 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5070 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.