WA HB1272 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state general obligation bonds and related accounts.
Title
Concerning state general obligation bonds and related accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Effective date 5/15/2009. | |
2009-05-15 | Chapter 498, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-15 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-27 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 15; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-26 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2009-04-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-26 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-26 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-03 | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-04-03 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-04-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5223 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.