WA HB1271 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning organ transport vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning organ transport vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseEffective date 7/23/2023.
2023-05-04HouseChapter 290, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-04HouseGovernor signed.
2023-04-19HouseDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-18SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-17HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-14HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2023-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-04-05SenateCommittee amendment
2023-03-24SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-03-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-03-20SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2023-03-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2023-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2023-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-03House1st substitute bill substituted
2023-02-14HousePlaced on second reading suspension calendar.
2023-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-02HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

SB5177 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1873New CodeSee Bill Text
1873030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1873081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1873140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604New CodeSee Bill Text
4637190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4637380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4637670Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4661165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4661210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4752025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6864010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1271&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1271.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1271-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1271-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1271-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1271-S%20AMS%20TRAN%20S2251.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1271%20HBA%20TR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1271%20HBR%20TR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1271-S%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1271-S%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1271-S%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1271-S%20HBR%20SA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1271-S%20HBR%20PL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1271-S%20HBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65723
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67012
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68378
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127788&actionText=TR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30613&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127788&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1271&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127788&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=31068&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127788&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1271&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127788&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-14-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1271&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback