WA HB1269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access to express toll lanes on Interstate 405 for certain persons undergoing medical treatment.
Title
Concerning access to express toll lanes on Interstate 405 for certain persons undergoing medical treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1269&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1269.pdf |