WA HB1268 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding hemp as a component of commercial animal feed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding hemp as a component of commercial animal feed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-25HouseEffective date 7/24/2015.
2015-04-25HouseChapter 106, 2015 Laws.
2015-04-25HouseGovernor signed.
2015-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2015-04-17SenatePresident signed.
2015-04-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-04-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2015-04-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-04-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-04-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-04-07SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2015-04-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2015-03-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2015-03-13SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2015-03-12SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2015-03-12SenateAWRD - Majority; do pass.
2015-03-12SenatePublic hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2015-03-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
2015-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2015-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-02-27HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-02-12HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-02-11HouseAGNR - Majority; do pass.
2015-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2015-02-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback