WA HB1267 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning investigation of potential criminal conduct arising from police use of force, including custodial injuries, and other officer-involved incidents.
Title
Concerning investigation of potential criminal conduct arising from police use of force, including custodial injuries, and other officer-involved incidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Chapter 318, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-03 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-19 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 114 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 93 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 26 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | New Code | See Bill Text |