WA HB1263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning support for students experiencing homelessness.
Title
Concerning support for students experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-18 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5324 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.