WA HB1262 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning background investigations of peace officers, reserve officers, and corrections officers.
Title
Concerning background investigations of peace officers, reserve officers, and corrections officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 101 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |