WA HB1258 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the operation, authorization, and permitting of microenterprise home kitchens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the operation, authorization, and permitting of microenterprise home kitchens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-25SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2021-03-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-03-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-09HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-09House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-10HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
69New CodeSee Bill Text
6907New CodeSee Bill Text
7054New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1258&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1258.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1258-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1258-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1258-S2.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1258-S2%20AMH%20GRIF%20ALLI%20104.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1258-S2%20AMH%20FRAM%20ALLI%20108.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1258-S2.E%20AMS%20AWNP%20S2333.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1258-S2.E%20AMS%20WELL%20S2863.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1258%20HBA%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1258%20HBR%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1258%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1258-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1258-S2.E%20SBA%20AWNP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1258-S2.E%20SBR%20AWNP%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1258-S2.E%20SBR%20AWNP%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1258-S2.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1258-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1258-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123558&actionText=LG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28558&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123558&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28691&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123558&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1258&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123558&actionText=AWNP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28887&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123558&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Agriculture%2C%20Water%2C%20Natural%20Resources%20%26amp%3B%20Parks.&mId=28996&isIni

Bill Comments

feedback