WA HB1252 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning crime committed by business entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning crime committed by business entities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2019-02-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-31HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback