WA HB1251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning water systems' notice to customers of public health considerations.
Title
Concerning water systems' notice to customers of public health considerations.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | House | Chapter 140, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-27 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5215 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.