WA HB1251 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authorization of wheeled all-terrain vehicles on state highways.
Title
Concerning the authorization of wheeled all-terrain vehicles on state highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 121, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |