WA HB1251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the appointment of counsel for youth in dependency court proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the appointment of counsel for youth in dependency court proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-24HousePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-09HouseJUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB5363 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback