WA HB1250 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding labeling of marijuana products.
Title
Regarding labeling of marijuana products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5298 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1250&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1250.pdf |