WA HB1246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning school bus safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning school bus safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-30HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-30HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Education

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback