WA HB1241 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Planning under the growth management act.
Title
Planning under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. April Berg [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] |
Rep. Emily Wicks [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Local Government (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Housing & Local Government (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Local Government (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Housing & Local Government (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 192, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Local Government. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-14 | House | LG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-08 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2021-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-10 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-10 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |