WA HB1238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating new full-time tenure track positions at the state's four-year public institutions of higher education.
Title
Creating new full-time tenure track positions at the state's four-year public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |