WA HB1234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing private health plan coverage of contraceptives.
Title
Addressing private health plan coverage of contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-16 | House | Chapter 293, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5554 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.