WA HB1234 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain building permit fees.
Title
Modifying certain building permit fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-23 | House | GGIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2015-02-05 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-05 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5183 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.