WA HB1231 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain traffic lane merge education and testing.
Title
Requiring certain traffic lane merge education and testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 20 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 82 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 82 | 430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |