WA HB1230 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring school districts and other public education entities to make information from the department of health available.
Title
Requiring school districts and other public education entities to make information from the department of health available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-25 | House | Chapter 173, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 320 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |