WA HB1225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 68, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning school-based health centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning school-based health centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseChapter 68, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-19SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-26House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-17HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness.
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-27HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4370New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1225&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1225.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1225-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1225-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1225-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1225-S%20AMH%20CORR%20PATT%20035.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1225%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1225%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1225%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1225-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1225-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1225-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123492&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28384&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123492&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20Health%20Care%20%26amp%3B%20Wellness.&mId=28620&isInit=False&biennium=20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123492&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1225&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123492&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28842&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123492&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123492&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1225&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback