WA HB1224 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning spring blade knives.
Title
Concerning spring blade knives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 41 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 251 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |