WA HB1220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a nonvoting representative from the office of the insurance commissioner to the public employees' benefits board.
Title
Adding a nonvoting representative from the office of the insurance commissioner to the public employees' benefits board.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-05 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5275 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.