WA HB1216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning nonfirearm measures to increase school safety and student well-being.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning nonfirearm measures to increase school safety and student well-being.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-07HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Same As/Similar To

SB5317 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback