WA HB1213 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of veteran for the purposes of the county veterans assistance fund.
Title
Concerning the definition of veteran for the purposes of the county veterans assistance fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 76, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-01-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-04 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-02 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-02 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB5171 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.