WA HB1211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Hearing: Feb 19 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting Washington's clean energy economy and transitioning to a clean, affordable, and reliable energy future.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting Washington's clean energy economy and transitioning to a clean, affordable, and reliable energy future.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Finance.
2019-02-05HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-05HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Same As/Similar To

SB5116 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-18 - Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback