WA HB1210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing nonresident children from military families to enroll in Washington's public schools prior to arrival in the state.
Title
Allowing nonresident children from military families to enroll in Washington's public schools prior to arrival in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 72, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5771 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.