WA HB1209 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning immunity protection for nonmedical assistance.
Title
Concerning immunity protection for nonmedical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 66, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |