WA HB1202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ensuring fairness and compliance with public works and procurement practices.
Title
Concerning ensuring fairness and compliance with public works and procurement practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 9:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1202&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1202.pdf |